Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chrystal A Robinson, Derek A Robinson, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kirwan, Terry J., against Joshua Cleveland, Joshua Cleveland Masonry Plus Llc, represented by Conners, John D., in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Scott Del Conte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott Del Conte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 29, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: June 25, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 25, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: August 16, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: November 18, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 05, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: June 27, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 02, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 02, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: December 05, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 27, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 30, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 27, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 06, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 27, 2022SUMMONS
Date: September 14, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: May 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 27, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: June 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 27, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 27, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: May 23, 2023AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 27, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Trial Scheduling Letter |
||
May 23, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
March 31, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 27, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First set of Interrogatories |
||
December 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A text messages |
||
December 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B photographs |
||
December 27, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiffs' Notice to Produce |
||
December 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B cancelled check |
||
December 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Report of Incident |
||
December 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Palermo Town Court, Small Claims documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.