Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Elizabeth Boardway, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Morawski, Joseph Paul, against Anthony Halstead, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Scott Del Conte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott Del Conte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Constructive Trust) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeTrusts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 13, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Electronic Mail |
||
December 09, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 09, 2022 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Order to Show Cause, returnable on December 20, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. |
||
December 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Retainer Agreement with Plaintiff |
||
December 08, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 08, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
December 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Letter to Defendant encl. quitclaim docs 11.4.22 |
||
December 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Decision Order and Judgment |
||
December 08, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 23, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Includes Decision, Order and Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.