Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Gunther, Tess E, against Ryan Burridge, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 22, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 22, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 21, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: December 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) SETTLEMENT STIPULATION |
||
November 22, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 09, 2022 |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI |
||
November 09, 2022 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PC REQUEST |
||
November 09, 2022 | Affirmation | ||
November 09, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
September 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 22, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 21, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
August 26, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q60683706542 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.