Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Langlois, Christopher P, against Darren Greenfield, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 25, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: September 12, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: June 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 10, 2022 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
June 17, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
June 17, 2022 |
PROOF OF SERVICE THE CURE LETTER AND PROOF OF MAILING |
||
June 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 17, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 21, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
September 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 25, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.