Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Beth Mccrobie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Shanley, Kristin Ann, against Mark Mccrobie, represented by Dimartino, Anthony J., in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
December 27, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
December 23, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
December 22, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
December 22, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
December 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
December 22, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
June 16, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
March 21, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
November 05, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.