Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lauri L Mcrae, Robert J Mcrae, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fennell, Timothy J., against Amanda L Bailey, represented by Miller, Keith Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Spencer Ludington presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSpencer Ludington Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 28, 2021STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 26, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 22, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 26, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: June 27, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: September 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 06, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 05, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 22, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: April 27, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 14, 2021ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: October 05, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: April 26, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 07, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 06, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 05, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 05, 2023 | ORDER - DISMISSAL | ||
September 19, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 25, 2023 |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Lauri McRae |
||
June 29, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Withdraw of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.