Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Michael Cooper, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 27, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 28, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 09, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
September 28, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 28, 2021 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
September 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice for Service |
||
September 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation |
||
September 28, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts and Sale of Account by Original Creditor | ||
June 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 21, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 27, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.