Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kyle R Milk, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Otto, Susan Elizabeth, Tyreman, Erin M, against David Menard, Janet Omara, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Scott Del Conte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott Del Conte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Article 15 Proceeding) |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: July 30, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: July 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 14, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 20, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: December 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 20, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001) B. Right of Way
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) A. Summons.Complaint
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2021 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) Decision and Order (Motions Nos. 1 and 2) |
||
December 07, 2021 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Decision and Order (Motions Nos. 1 and 2) |
||
December 07, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 05, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter |
||
August 23, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter |
||
August 23, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. Scott Del Conte |
||
August 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS |
||
August 20, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
August 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Whitaker survey map |
||
August 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C title map |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.