Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Morgan Omara Brown, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company A S O Morgan Omara Brown, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Murphy, Dennis D, against Bryon D Phillips, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Scott Del Conte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott Del Conte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 10, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: July 12, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 04, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 13, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 04, 2022ANSWER
Date: June 08, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT TO CEASE EFILING (UNREPRESENTED LITIGANT)
Date: June 08, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 10, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 13, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 12, 2021SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: February 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuance with Prejudice as to Bryon Phillps |
||
April 28, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 13, 2022 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
April 13, 2022 | SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) | ||
April 13, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
April 07, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation for Leave to Amend Pleadings, So Ordered |
||
April 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Proposed redlines Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint |
||
April 04, 2022 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
February 01, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 30, 2021 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.