Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Luz Rounds, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 28, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 23, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
August 20, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
August 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
August 20, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted |
||
August 20, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
August 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
August 20, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER Redacted |
||
August 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
June 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.