Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Phillip L Cobb, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Lanza, Salvatore F., against Angela L Cobb, represented by Genant, Robert Edward, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
December 12, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
December 09, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
December 09, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
December 09, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
December 02, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 01, 2022 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 22, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
July 10, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
March 15, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.