Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Brian Schumaker, Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company As Subrogee Of Brian And Pa, Patricia Schumaker, filed a(n) Subrogation - Insurance case represented by Coffey, Daniel William, Kirwan, Terry J., against Lowes Home Centers Llc, Utilitech Inc, represented by Bostick, Kenneth Ladon, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Product Liability (Subrogation) |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeSubrogation |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: August 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2023 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer to Third Amended Complaint with Cross Claims |
||
May 24, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 23, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
May 23, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 12, 2023 | NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION | ||
April 10, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
April 08, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 17, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 14, 2023 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
February 14, 2023 | SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.