Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Gerald W, Sheerin, John J, against Jade D Nelson, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 04, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 04, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: November 22, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 27, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 12, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: May 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 22, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
May 27, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement |
||
May 27, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 27, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 27, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
May 27, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 12, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
||
February 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-JADE D NELSON-46837828 |
||
February 04, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.