Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Frederick Sherman, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 31, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 08, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
March 31, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 31, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 31, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 03, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 03, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 12, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.