Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stephen Przepiora Jr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Kirwan, Timothy John, against Lisa Przepiora, represented by Lanza, Salvatore F., in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Scott Del Conte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott Del Conte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
July 29, 2022 | DECISION/ORDER AFTER HEARING | ||
July 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
July 07, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
June 23, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 17, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 17, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
March 31, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
March 07, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
February 07, 2022 | RETAINER AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.