Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Timothy M Sperbeck, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 21, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: November 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 04, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
April 21, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
April 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
April 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILTARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILTARY Redacted |
||
April 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
April 21, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
December 09, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 09, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 19, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.