Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Americu Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Radel, Patrick Gerard, against John J Polakiewicz, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Scott Del Conte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott Del Conte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 08, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 08, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 12, 2021 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) *Corrected* Statement for Judgment (proposed) |
||
February 11, 2021 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Order Awarding Summary Judgment and Attorneys' Fees |
||
February 01, 2021 |
ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Order Awarding Summary Judgment and attorneys' fees (proposed-amended) |
||
January 29, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order Awarding Summary Judgment and attorneys' fees (proposed) |
||
January 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A to Attorney Supplemental Affirmation--11/20/20 letter from Attorney Patrick G. Radel to de Exhibit A to Attorney Supplemental Affirmation--11/20/20 letter from Attorney Patrick G. Radel to de ... show more |
||
January 18, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Supplemental Attorney Affirmation of Patrick G. Radel, Esq. |
||
January 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B to Attorney Supplemental Affirmation-affidavit of mailing Bare Summons and Covid Notice to Exhibit B to Attorney Supplemental Affirmation-affidavit of mailing Bare Summons and Covid Notice to ... show more |
||
January 15, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mailing Bare Summons and COVID notice to defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.