Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Oswego Yacht Club, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by O'Neil, Matthew Warren, Smith, Robert J, against Oswego City Of, represented by Caraccioli, Kevin Coyer, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Breach Of Lease) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 23, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 02, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2020 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 05, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 02, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001) Consent Order |
||
October 02, 2020 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 01, 2020 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order |
||
October 01, 2020 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter to Judge Seiter re Proposed Order |
||
September 24, 2020 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 24, 2020 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
September 23, 2020 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memo of Law in Support |
||
September 23, 2020 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.