Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
David M Emmons, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Auser, Wallace Vancortlandt, against Bank Na Citizens, Citizens Financial Group Inc Formerly Known As Rbs Citizens, N.A. And Citizens Bank, N.A., Citizens Na Rbs, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Extinguish Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 17, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 17, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: December 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 24, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 17, 2020ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 18, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 29, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2021ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: February 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 08, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order w/Notice of Entry |
||
March 08, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
||
February 26, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
January 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 29, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 18, 2020 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 18, 2020 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
December 17, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
December 17, 2020 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.