Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pathfinder Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nicholson, James Michael, against Capital One Bank, Estate Of Edna Davis, Jerry L Davis Heir Of The Estate Of Edna Davis, Mac Davis Heir Of The Estate Of Edna Davis, Midland Funding Llc, (total of 7) See All represented by Langan, Mary Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time33 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2019STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation Stipulation discontinuing |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Mac Davis |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service (7) | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Notice of Electronic Filing |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.