Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against Community Bank Na, Five Star Bank, Hannock Kristin M Aka, Kristin M Aka Smith A K A Kristin M. Hannock, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Military Status Affidavit |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KRISTIN M. SMITH A/K/A KRISTIN M. HANNOCK |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE community bank |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FIVE STAR BANK |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYS dept of tax and finance |
|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted |
|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.