Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Joseph M Isabell, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions92 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time93 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 21, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: March 29, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION DOD |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.