Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Broyles, Mark K., Case, David P, against Credit Acceptance Corporation, Douglas L Hopp, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, represented by Larkin, William F, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions168 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time168 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 13, 2019MEMORANDUM
Date: November 08, 2019JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #004)
Date: June 07, 2019EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #004)
Date: June 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: March 11, 2019EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #003)
Date: March 11, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 05, 2019ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: December 03, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 03, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 08, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 08, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001) | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Non-Military |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Judgement of Foreclosue and Sale |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Referee Report of Sale |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Notice to Quit |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order for Writ of Assistance |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affimation |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.