Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Ken Wood, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 19, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions90 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time114 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: April 12, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 19, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.