Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, Renaissance Home Equity Loan Asset Backed Notes Series 2005-4, Renaissance Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-4, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., Leopold, Saul O, against Judy Ann Mcmahon, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions246 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time516 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 13, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 31, 2019ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: August 16, 2019STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 12, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 01, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 03, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 31, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2020 | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
November 19, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Supplemental Affidavit 3215(g)(3) |
||
October 31, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 31, 2019 | AFFIRMATION | ||
October 31, 2019 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 31, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #001) CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY |
||
October 31, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #001) DISMISSAL ORDER |
||
October 31, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #001) SECRETARY'S CERTIFICATION |
||
October 31, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #001) POWER OF ATTORNEY |
||
October 31, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION OF REGULARITY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.