Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust Corp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Baisley, Zack Everett, Debarba, Eric Phillip, Gallo, Deborah M, Rogers, Heather C, against A L Lee Memorial Hospital, Andrea Deceased Price, As Assignee Of Al Lee Memorial Hospital, As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin Of Andrea Price, Horizon Resources Llc As Assignee Of Al Lee Memorial Hospital, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with Scott J Delconte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott J Delconte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 24, 2018ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #003)
Date: December 11, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #003)
Date: October 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry for OOR | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #003) | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #003) | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #003) CPLR 3408 Notice |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #003) Attorney Affirmation in Support |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-O (Motion #003) Exhibits A-O |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #003) Proposed OOR |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Military Status Affidavit |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.