Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
A R Inc N, Bank Merrick, Nar Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Murtha, Timothy J, against William H Giles, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 11, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Invoices & Statements |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Additional Mailing Summons & Complaint |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non Military Status | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.