Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Stephanie Hayes, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions278 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time281 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.