Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Scott C Sargent, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions73 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 31, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: October 15, 2018SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT R&R FILE# 1245835 | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY-AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1245835 |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL-AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1245835 |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT R&R FILE #1245835 |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE #1245835 |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.