Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Americu Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Radel, Patrick Gerard, against Americu Credit Union, Am Main Frankfurt, Dz Bank Ag Aka Aka Dz Bank Ag Deutsche Zentral-Genossenschaftsbank, Frankfurt Am Main, Dz Bank Ag Deutsche Zentral Genossenschaftsbank Aka, Glen A Houser, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with Norman W Seiter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNorman W Seiter Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions171 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time322 days |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 07, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: May 22, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Extension of Sale Date |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT *Corrected* | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Requesting extension for Referee to sell |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Mail | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
January 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.