Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against John D Ayotte, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 09, 2018ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 17, 2018NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 07, 2019ANSWER
Date: August 27, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: August 17, 2018STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: January 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2019 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISCONTINUANCE R&R FILE# 1239215 |
||
January 08, 2019 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
August 27, 2018 | ANSWER | ||
August 17, 2018 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
August 17, 2018 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 09, 2018 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 09, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 18, 2018 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1239215 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.