Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pontiac Nursing Home Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Jacobson, Robert L, against City Of Assessor Oswego, City Of Oswego, Oswego City Of Board Of Assessment Review, represented by Caraccioli, Kevin Coyer, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with Norman W Seiter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNorman W Seiter Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time505 days |
PETITION
Date: July 17, 2018ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: August 12, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion #003)
Date: December 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #003) Stipulation and Consent Order |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CONSOLIDATION Stipulated Scheduling Order with Consolidation provision |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) Proposed Scheduling Order |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.