Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital Group Jh, Jh Portfolio Debt Equities Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Christopher R Nutting, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time38 days |
ANSWER
Date: August 07, 2018ANSWER
Date: August 20, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DHVN207051 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.