Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Amore, Dennis Andrew, Bolduc, Kristin Marie, Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, Maccagnano, Michelle Debora, (total of 5) See All against Norma L Mcdougall, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with Scott J Delconte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott J Delconte Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions564 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time650 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: April 04, 2019ANSWER
Date: May 22, 2018JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #001)
Date: November 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #001) | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE (Motion #001) Redacted |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS (Motion #001) | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.