Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Langlois, Christopher P, against Robert A Oreilly, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 26, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions274 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time315 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 26, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: March 07, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.