Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kenneth Scott Jr, Performance Heating And Cooling Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Poplawski, Ryan Michael, against Performance Heating And Cooling Inc, Sean Beardsley, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time478 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 15, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) Proposed order |
|
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order Relieving Counsel for Petitioner |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.