Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Irene E Perrigo, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 20, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions160 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time167 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 20, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: October 04, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1226712 |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY-AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1226712 |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL-AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1226712 |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT R&R FILE #1226712 |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE #1226712 |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.