Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Warshaw, David Barry, Winograd, Ian Zev, against Kelly Aka Daggett, Kelly Aka Fadden A K A Kelly Daggett, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 17, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions150 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time153 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 16, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: September 17, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION of Non Military Service |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.