Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Irene E Perrigo, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 16, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions443 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time473 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 16, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 16, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: August 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.