Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Frank E Whiting, Holly J Whiting, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fennell, Timothy J., against Brad M Voss, represented by Karambelkar, Aalok J., in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with Norman W Seiter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNorman W Seiter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2020SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: September 24, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Ambulance report |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Accident Report |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Plaintiffs' Bill of Particulars |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001) | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING DURING THE COVID-19 PUBLIC HEALTH EMERGENCY (Motion #001) | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Trooper Heath Sworn Statement |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Transcript Trooper Alan Heath |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.