Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with James W. McCarthy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W. McCarthy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time125 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
June 12, 2014 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT MCCARTHY (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
June 12, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
May 01, 2014 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
March 28, 2014 | Motion |
RESTORE (Motion #001) Decided: 06/12/2014ORDER Before Justice: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
March 28, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
March 28, 2014 | Hearing |
PRE-NOTE OF ISSUE RESTORATION MCCARTHY (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
February 07, 2014 | Hearing |
PRE-DISMISSED MCCARTHY (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.