Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Orleans County, NY, . Orleans County, NY Superior Courts with HON. JAMES P. PUNCH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. JAMES P. PUNCH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2005 |
CategoryContested Matrimonial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrleans County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time164 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2006 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED PUNCH (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
|
January 26, 2006 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PUNCH (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
|
January 23, 2006 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PUNCH (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
|
November 28, 2005 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PUNCH (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
|
October 31, 2005 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PUNCH (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
|
September 19, 2005 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PUNCH (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
|
August 15, 2005 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PUNCH (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.