Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other case in the jurisdiction of Orleans County, NY, . Orleans County, NY Superior Courts with HON. JAMES P. PUNCH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. JAMES P. PUNCH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 22, 2013 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOrleans County, NY |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2013 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED PUNCH (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
|
October 30, 2013 | Hearing |
PRE-APPEAL DEFENDANT PUNCH (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
|
September 30, 2013 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED PUNCH (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
|
September 30, 2013 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) PUNCH (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
|
July 16, 2013 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) PUNCH (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
|
May 22, 2013 | Motion |
MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGM (Motion #001) Decided: 09/30/2013DECISION AND ORDER- DENIED. Before Justice: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
|
May 22, 2013 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) PUNCH (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JAMES P. PUNCH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.