Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sheylla N Lemus-Espinas, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mackay, Kevin M., against Carlos R Martinez, represented by Neusch, Michele Lee, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
February 04, 2022 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
January 10, 2022 | ADMISSION OF SERVICE | ||
December 07, 2021 | COMPLAINT AMENDED | ||
September 02, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.