Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kelsey Fosstveit, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Colman, Ariella M., Hart, Caramia R., against Garnet Health Doctors, P.C., Garnet Health Medical Center, Jose B. Toro M.D., Lydia Akite-Ogwal R.N., Mohammad Siddiqui M.D., (total of 6) See All represented by Mastellone, Kenneth John, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with James L Hyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L Hyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 16, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 10, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 10, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 16, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 24, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 24, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 25, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: January 24, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 24, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 25, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 28, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 24, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 16, 2021NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: January 24, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 11, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 10, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 25, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 03, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 18, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 25, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 25, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 03, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: February 10, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 28, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
July 13, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 12, 2022 | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST | ||
July 11, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 05, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Judge - re: EBT dates and outstanding discovery Letter to the Judge - re: EBT dates and outstanding discovery Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
May 09, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
March 18, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
February 03, 2022 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Proposed PC Conference Order |
||
February 03, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.