Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shannon Mcneill, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Kleister, Christopher B, Kraiza, Michael Alanson, against Andrew Mcneill, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Maria S Vazquezdoles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria S Vazquezdoles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 19, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
October 27, 2022 | PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED DISPOSITION | ||
October 24, 2022 | DRUG/ALCOHOL EVALUATOR APPOINTMENT ORDER | ||
September 01, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
August 22, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
August 10, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
July 29, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
July 29, 2022 | ANNUAL INCOME WORKSHEET | ||
July 29, 2022 | RETAINER AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.