Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, against Javier Mercedes, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 18, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) SETTLEMENT STIPULATION |
||
March 22, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
March 22, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
March 22, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
March 22, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
March 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
March 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
March 22, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
March 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.