Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
In The Matter Of The Foreclosure Of Tax Liens By Proceeding In Rem Pursuant To Article Eleven Of The Real Property Tax Law By The County Of Orange, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Nothnagle, Matthew Joseph, against Ricky Guzman, represented by Haysom, Simon David, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Sandra B Sciortino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra B Sciortino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
PETITION Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 11, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 24, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 05, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
December 05, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 30, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 22, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 12, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 03, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 29, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 01, 2022 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.