Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Caroline Kay Hanna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sobo, Gregory Marc, against Boruch Perl, Mordechai Perl, represented by Mazzaro, Thomas Robert, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Elena Goldberg-Velazquez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElena Goldberg-Velazquez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 25, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 14, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 06, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 07, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 14, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 25, 2021TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: September 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 04, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 04, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 03, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 26, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 03, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 03, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 26, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 14, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 17, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: September 12, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 04, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 04, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 07, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Insurance Disclosure |
||
September 12, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
September 07, 2022 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Notice of Expert Witness Disclosure |
||
July 22, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
June 17, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Post Deposition Demand |
||
November 26, 2021 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
November 26, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice to Produce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.