Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Gunther, Tess E, against Fitz A Colquhoun, represented by Unrepresented And Not Participating In Efiling, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with E Loren Williams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeE Loren Williams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: September 02, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER TRANSFERRING CASE TO NEWBURGH CITY COURT |
||
November 16, 2022 | ORDER - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE | ||
October 18, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notification Ltr. to Defendant re: conference |
||
October 17, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 09, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notification Ltr. to Defendant re: PC |
||
September 02, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
September 02, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 26, 2022 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PC REQUEST |
||
August 26, 2022 | Affirmation | ||
August 26, 2022 |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.